open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-04784-
    Party Name:TRICIA M. WHITE
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Intent to Lodge Dismissal Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oStipulated Order]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Stipulation (Notice of)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Objection to Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition - Case Upload (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756838
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =