Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-04781-
    Party Name:DESIRAE ROSE MCCOY
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oDenying Application to Waive Filing Fee and to Pay Fee in Installments (Judge Order)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint (Initial)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756835
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =