open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-04780-
    Party Name:KARI ALTIZER and ADAM ALTIZER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:June 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (335 fee)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oDenying Application to Waive Filing Fee and to Pay Fee in Installments (Judge Order)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756834
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =