Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-04779-
    Party Name:STEVEN FUGATE and RAVEN FUGATE
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Objection to Exempt Property (batch)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oWage Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Wage Order (Motion for)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Schedules]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756833
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =