open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-04775-
    Party Name:ANTHONY RAY MARTINEZ
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756829
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =