Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-04770-
    Party Name:BRANDON GOODWIN and KAYLEE HEFFELFINGER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756824
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =