open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02554
    Party Name:King v. Arizona State Prison Complex, Florence et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Habeas Petition (State/2254)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Receipt of E-Service by AZ AG]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [AZ AG Service Order (2254)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170315
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =