open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02556
    Party Name:Morris v. Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170287
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =