open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00223
    Party Name:Duralar Technologies LLC v. Plasma Coating Technologies Incorporated
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170278
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =