open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-cr-01241-1
    Party Name:USA v. Chaparro-Sanchez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant & Order of Referral]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Terminate Merged Defendant]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance Without Counsel (Text Only) - Tucson]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170251
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =