open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00908-1
    Party Name:USA v. Tzompaxtle-Sanchez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admit/Deny Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant & Order of Referral]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgment of Trial Date]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1166703
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =