open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02562
    Party Name:Garcia-Goff v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:October 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170397
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =