open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:11-cr-01740-1
    Party Name:USA v. Leckner
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Disposition Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admit/Deny Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant & Order of Referral]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?612723
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =