open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-04704
    Party Name:Fallon v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA ]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1190756
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =