open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:19-cv-08200
    Party Name:Nez v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reset Cal Conflict - Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1190744
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =