U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-01468-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Felix-Esquer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Lodged Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty on Lesser Offense)]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.