U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00750-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kitaeff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue Sentencing ]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Lodged Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.