open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-bk-10149
    Party Name:Merissa Griffin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Financial Management Course (Form 423) - Debtor Education]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [none]
    Date Published:March 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?281975
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =