open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-bk-10148
    Party Name:James Capps
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Courtroom Deputy Calendar Update]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Revoke Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Final Payment in FULL]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:March 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [none]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend / Enlarge Time to Pay Filing Fee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Add Judge and Trustee]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?281974
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =