open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04019
    Party Name:Kendrick v. Ghormley
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Service]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order PLRA Fee]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Pleading to be Filed]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Complaint 42:1983]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring Case Out - District]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?56138
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =