open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:2:19-bk-70372
    Party Name:Nancy Perdomo and Rene Perdomo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Summary Notice of Claims Filed]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held - Withdrawn]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Modify Plan]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom) V3.4]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Financial Management Course (Form 423) - Debtor Education]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan- case upload]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?163563
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =