open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01027
    Party Name:Miller v. Merritt et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service (Non-Summons)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Service]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Pleading to be Filed]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Complaint 42:1983]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring Case Out - District]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116963
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =