open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:3:19-cv-03041
    Party Name:Crook v. Woods et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Memo]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Pleading to be Filed]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Complaint 42:1983]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring Case Out - District]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117149
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =