open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-05112
    Party Name:Mayes v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Requested as to USA]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Service]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice - SSA]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?57130
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =