open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04090
    Party Name:Everhart v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Response to Motion - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Brief in Support]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint Referred (42:1983)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Service]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Pleading to be Filed]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Referred (42:1983)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?57828
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =