open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:5:19-bk-14230
    Party Name:Jevenee Mosby
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Revoke Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286114
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =