open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-bk-14228
    Party Name:Zachary Mulligan and Christina Hensley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Financial Management Course (Form 423) - Debtor Education]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wetzel, Frederick S. [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286112
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =