open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:3:19-bk-14227
    Party Name:Cornell R Crawford and Doris J Crawford
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286111
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =