open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:5:19-bk-14226
    Party Name:Jessica McSwain
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [none]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Final Payment in FULL]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Modify Plan]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom) V3.4]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:September 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 (fee)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286110
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =