open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:5:19-bk-72223
    Party Name:Brett McCloud Lamar and Amy Lynn Lamar
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Financial Management Course (Form 423) - Debtor Education]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Courtroom Deputy Calendar Update]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Objection]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rucker, Bianca [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?165451
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =