open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01036
    Party Name:Allen v. Love et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Memo]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint Referred (42:1983)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Service]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Referred (42:1983)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?58234
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =