U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-11832
  • Case Name: Phillip Herring
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Not Held]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Approval]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Modified Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.