Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:3:14-cv-03985
    Party Name:Telesocial Inc. v. Orange S.A. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit Location]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Notes]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Selection]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Management Order]
    Date Published:June 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibits]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Brief]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference Statement]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Form of Verdict]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change In Counsel]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Opposition/Response]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate/Proof of Service]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Interested Entities]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Discovery Letter Brief]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Motion to File Under Seal]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Letter Brief]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11]
    Date Published:August 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opposition/Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letters Rogatory]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Hearing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response ( Non Motion )]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Order]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Conference - Further]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Case Management Statement]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Remark]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Proposed Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?280397
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =