Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Report]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Generic Text Only Entry]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:16-cv-04424
    Party Name:Vahe Ambarsoomzadeh v. City of Glendale et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?650940

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 1 =