open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of California
    Case Number:17-09006
    Party Name:Bank of Stockton v. J & B Dairy
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Close Adversary Proceeding]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Service of Document (Certificate)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Service of Document]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Matter Held *]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Service of Order (Certificate)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order for Judge's Signature - Service List Attached]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Matter Continued *]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [EFILED RECEIPT - Adversary Fee Paid]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BDRP]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order to Confer]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Complaint (Intake)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Adversary Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.caeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?600487
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =