open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:17-cv-05491
    Party Name:V.R., a minor et al v. City of Bell
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Guardian ad Litem]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (Motion related)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Chief District Judge Transferring Case]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:July 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 27, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684718
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =