Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of California

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:18-40032
    Party Name:Connor Frett Cochran
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [File Missing Documents-Chp 11 Individual]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pmt of State and Fed Taxes]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generate 341 Notices]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Payment of Taxes]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors 11]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?562190
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =