open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03737
    Party Name:Chrysostom Dominicus v. Superior Court of California County of Norwalk
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss (cause or other)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enlargement of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enlargement of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appointment of Counsel]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93)]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?709500
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =