open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-06519
    Party Name:Roderick Washington v. City of Glendale Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appeal IFP]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement (Motion related)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?718415
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =