open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-07862
    Party Name:George Ricks v. City of Pomona et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (Motion related)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection/Opposition (Motion related)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?722444
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =