open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-09023
    Party Name:Tina Foafoa v. City of Lakewood et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?726307
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =