open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:2:18-cv-10378
    Party Name:Ray Cash et al v. City of Long Beach et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference - optional html form]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Guardian ad Litem]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?731395
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =