Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00004-1
    Party Name:USA v. Liao
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (G-01)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Document]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unredacted Document]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Constitutional Rights]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Post Indictment]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum by U S Attorney re Investigative Action]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Summary (CR-72)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?733461
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =