open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of California
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00006-1
    Party Name:USA v. Heindel
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (plea accepted)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Constitutional Rights]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Post Indictment]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Only Scheduling Notice]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum by U S Attorney re Investigative Action]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Summary (CR-72)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cacd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?733536
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =