Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00019-1
    Party Name:USA v. Shoemaker
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ID of Counsel Hearing]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - CJA23 Submitted]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Referred to ECF]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?336932
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =