Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00235
    Party Name:Ortiz v. Whitaker
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate/Proof of Service]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Assigned by Intake]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?337023
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =