Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:19-40089
    Party Name:Ronald Clyde Travis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Amended Schedules (A-C and G-J - No Fee Required)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Generate 341 Notices]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [none]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - Case Upload ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Voluntary Petition Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kasolas, Michael G. [Voluntary Petition Statement of Social Security- case upload]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - Case Upload ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Statement of Social Security- case upload]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?570893
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =