Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:19-00117-CL7
    Party Name:Paul S. Lovell and Laurie A. Lovell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Special Notice (Request) (paperless entry)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Meeting of Creditors (Notice of Continuance)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Financial Management - Certificate of Debtor Education]
    Date Published:January 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor (caseupload)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Joint Debtor (caseupload)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barclay, Christopher R. [Statement About Your Social Security Number (121) (secured image)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.casb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433280
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =