open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00060-1
    Party Name:USA v. Wahhab
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Notice]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Proposed Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Referred to ECF]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?337956
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =