open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of California

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:3:14-cr-02244-1
    Party Name:USA v. Vega-Parra
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Revocation of Supervised Release/Probation]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentence on Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Hearing (No PDF)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation of Supervised Release (w/ Schedules)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Duty Hearings]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued - Supervised Release/Probation]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USPO 12C Request and Order for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.casd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?450185
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =